open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Maryland

MARYLAND PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Maryland
    Case Number:14-17214
    Party Name:Monica Tracy Williams
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
    Date Published:September 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [Final Decree and Close Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:September 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [Discharging Debtor]
    Date Published:September 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report (batch)]
    Date Published:September 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [Debtor's Affidavit Requesting Discharge]
    Date Published:August 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:August 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [Response to Notice of Final Cure Payment Rule 3002.1]
    Date Published:July 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [Notice of Final Cure Payment (batch)]
    Date Published:July 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [Notice of Completion of Plan Payments (batch)]
    Date Published:June 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
    Date Published:March 21, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:October 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.mdb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?640184
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 1 =