open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Maryland

MARYLAND PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Maryland
    Case Number:16-13285
    Party Name:MARY HOPE CRABANO
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rose, Cheryl E. [Discharging Trustee and Closing Case]
    Date Published:February 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rose, Cheryl E. [Notice of Substitution of Attorney (multi)]
    Date Published:November 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rose, Cheryl E. [Amended Order]
    Date Published:November 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Branigan, Timothy P. [Final Decree and Close Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:October 30, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Branigan, Timothy P. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report (batch)]
    Date Published:October 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rose, Cheryl E. [Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:October 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rose, Cheryl E. [Show Cause]
    Date Published:September 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rose, Cheryl E. [Relief from Stay]
    Date Published:September 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Branigan, Timothy P. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
    Date Published:September 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Branigan, Timothy P. [Discharging Debtor]
    Date Published:September 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rose, Cheryl E. [Disposition Without Hearing]
    Date Published:September 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Branigan, Timothy P. [Debtor's Affidavit Requesting Discharge]
    Date Published:August 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Branigan, Timothy P. [Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:August 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Branigan, Timothy P. [Case Eligible to Close Without Discharge]
    Date Published:August 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rose, Cheryl E. [Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:August 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rose, Cheryl E. [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
    Date Published:August 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rose, Cheryl E. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:May 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rose, Cheryl E. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Requirement to Complete Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:May 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rose, Cheryl E. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:May 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rose, Cheryl E. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:May 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rose, Cheryl E. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 Asset]
    Date Published:May 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rose, Cheryl E. [Notice of Deadline for Filing Statement of Intention]
    Date Published:May 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Branigan, Timothy P. [Certificate of Compliance]
    Date Published:April 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Branigan, Timothy P. [ADI process Return Mail]
    Date Published:April 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Branigan, Timothy P. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:March 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Branigan, Timothy P. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
    Date Published:March 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Notice of Prior Filing]
    Date Published:March 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Notice of Deadline for Filing Missing Documents]
    Date Published:March 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Branigan, Timothy P. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:January 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Branigan, Timothy P. [Disposition Without Hearing]
    Date Published:January 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Branigan, Timothy P. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:December 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Branigan, Timothy P. [Deficiency Notice]
    Date Published:December 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Social Security Number Verification Page]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.mdb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?640610
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 1 =