open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Maryland

MARYLAND PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Maryland
    Case Number:14-17283
    Party Name:Jeffery Michael Kunkle
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Thomas, Robert S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
    Date Published:February 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Thomas, Robert S. [Final Decree and Close Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:February 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Thomas, Robert S. [Discharging Debtor]
    Date Published:February 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Thomas, Robert S. [Notice of Change of Address]
    Date Published:February 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Thomas, Robert S. [Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:January 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Thomas, Robert S. [Debtor's Affidavit Requesting Discharge]
    Date Published:January 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Thomas, Robert S. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report (batch)]
    Date Published:January 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Thomas, Robert S. [Notice of Completion of Plan Payments (batch)]
    Date Published:January 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Thomas, Robert S. [Assignment of Claim]
    Date Published:June 06, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Thomas, Robert S. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:April 27, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Thomas, Robert S. [Notice of Substitution of Attorney (multi)]
    Date Published:October 18, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Thomas, Robert S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:April 09, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Thomas, Robert S. [Relief from Stay]
    Date Published:April 07, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Thomas, Robert S. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
    Date Published:March 30, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Thomas, Robert S. [Disposition Without Hearing]
    Date Published:January 05, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Thomas, Robert S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:December 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Thomas, Robert S. [Response]
    Date Published:December 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Thomas, Robert S. [Deficiency Notice]
    Date Published:December 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Thomas, Robert S. [none]
    Date Published:November 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Thomas, Robert S. [Relief from Stay and Notice of Motion]
    Date Published:November 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Vetter, Gerard R. (Ch13) [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:September 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Vetter, Gerard R. (Ch13) [Employee Payment Order]
    Date Published:September 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cosby, Ellen W. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.mdb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?640267
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 1 =