open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Maryland

MARYLAND PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Maryland
    Case Number:14-17104
    Party Name:Dwayne A Frost
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Branigan, Timothy P. [Discharging Trustee and Closing Case]
    Date Published:October 12, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Branigan, Timothy P. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report (batch)]
    Date Published:September 28, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Branigan, Timothy P. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:September 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Branigan, Timothy P. [Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case]
    Date Published:August 01, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Branigan, Timothy P. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
    Date Published:March 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Branigan, Timothy P. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:September 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Branigan, Timothy P. [Court Instruction]
    Date Published:September 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Branigan, Timothy P. [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:September 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Branigan, Timothy P. [Notice (court use)]
    Date Published:July 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Branigan, Timothy P. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.mdb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?640082
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 2 =