open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Maryland

MARYLAND PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Maryland
    Case Number:17-13449
    Party Name:Nicole Allison Jenkins
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [Discharging Trustee and Closing Case]
    Date Published:June 09, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report (batch)]
    Date Published:June 08, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:May 02, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [Chapter 13 341 Meeting Not Held]
    Date Published:April 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [Line]
    Date Published:April 27, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:March 29, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
    Date Published:March 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [Extend Time]
    Date Published:March 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:March 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
    Date Published:March 27, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [Receipt of Installment Payment (Final)]
    Date Published:March 24, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:March 16, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:March 16, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [Notice of Debtors Ineligibility for Discharge]
    Date Published:March 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [Notice of Prior Filing]
    Date Published:March 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [Receipt of Installment Payment]
    Date Published:March 14, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
    Date Published:March 14, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
    Date Published:March 14, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [Social Security Number Verification Page]
    Date Published:March 14, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:March 14, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Nesse, Janet M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.mdb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?640017
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 1 =