open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Maryland

MARYLAND PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Maryland
    Case Number:14-14583
    Party Name:Herbert Noel Wright, Jr. and Carlene Ann Wright
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [Final Decree and Close Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:July 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report (batch)]
    Date Published:July 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [ADI process Return Mail]
    Date Published:May 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
    Date Published:April 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [Discharging Debtor]
    Date Published:April 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [Notice of Completion of Plan Payments (batch)]
    Date Published:March 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
    Date Published:October 31, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [Amended Schedules]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.mdb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?637481
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 1 =