open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Maryland

MARYLAND PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Maryland
    Case Number:14-10491
    Party Name:John C Esenwa
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Final Decree and Close Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:October 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report (batch)]
    Date Published:October 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [Unclaimed Funds(batch)]
    Date Published:August 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [ADI process Return Mail]
    Date Published:August 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
    Date Published:July 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [Discharging Debtor]
    Date Published:July 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [Debtor's Affidavit Requesting Discharge]
    Date Published:June 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:June 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [Response to Notice of Final Cure Payment Rule 3002.1]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [Notice of Final Cure Payment (batch)]
    Date Published:June 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [Notice of Completion of Plan Payments (batch)]
    Date Published:May 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [Withdrawal of Document]
    Date Published:February 21, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [Withdrawal of Claim]
    Date Published:February 17, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [Disallow Claims]
    Date Published:February 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [none]
    Date Published:December 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [Redact and Restrict Public Access]
    Date Published:December 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:May 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing]
    Date Published:May 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:May 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [Court Instruction]
    Date Published:April 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [Disposition Without Hearing]
    Date Published:March 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.mdb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?633217
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 3 =