open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Maryland

MARYLAND PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Maryland
    Case Number:13-26131
    Party Name:Renee Louise McCray
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldstein, Charles R. [District Court re: Appeal]
    Date Published:September 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldstein, Charles R. [Memorandum of Decision (USDC)]
    Date Published:September 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldstein, Charles R. [Support Document]
    Date Published:June 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldstein, Charles R. [Appellee Designation]
    Date Published:May 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldstein, Charles R. [Amended Notice of Appeal]
    Date Published:May 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldstein, Charles R. [Objection]
    Date Published:May 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldstein, Charles R. [Appellant Designation]
    Date Published:May 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldstein, Charles R. [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:May 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldstein, Charles R. [Notice of Docketing Record on Appeal (court only)]
    Date Published:April 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldstein, Charles R. [Transmittal of Record on Appeal to District Court/Fourth Circuit]
    Date Published:April 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldstein, Charles R. [Notice (court use)]
    Date Published:April 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldstein, Charles R. [Notice of Appeal]
    Date Published:April 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldstein, Charles R. [Reconsider]
    Date Published:April 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldstein, Charles R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:April 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldstein, Charles R. [Response]
    Date Published:December 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldstein, Charles R. [Deficiency Satisfied]
    Date Published:December 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldstein, Charles R. [Opposition]
    Date Published:November 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldstein, Charles R. [Receipt of Filing Fee]
    Date Published:November 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldstein, Charles R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:November 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldstein, Charles R. [Deficiency Notice]
    Date Published:November 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldstein, Charles R. [Reopen Chapter 7 Case]
    Date Published:November 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [Discharging Trustee and Closing Case]
    Date Published:July 05, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report (batch)]
    Date Published:July 03, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [Relief from Stay]
    Date Published:June 27, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [Dismiss Case]
    Date Published:June 26, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [Hearing Set]
    Date Published:June 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [Response]
    Date Published:June 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:June 12, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [none]
    Date Published:June 05, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [Relief from Stay and Notice of Motion]
    Date Published:June 05, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [BNC Recreated Order/Notice]
    Date Published:June 02, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [Extend Time]
    Date Published:May 25, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
    Date Published:May 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
    Date Published:May 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:May 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [Social Security Number Verification Page]
    Date Published:May 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:May 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [Receipt of Installment Payment (Final)]
    Date Published:March 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [Notice of Debtors Ineligibility for Discharge]
    Date Published:March 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [Notice of Prior Filing]
    Date Published:March 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:March 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:March 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:March 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [Receipt of Installment Payment]
    Date Published:March 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
    Date Published:March 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldstein, Charles R. [Close Adversary Case]
    Date Published:November 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldstein, Charles R. [Quash]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.mdb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?626943
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 3 =