open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Maryland

MARYLAND PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Maryland
    Case Number:19-14636
    Party Name:Tamara Thompson
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Greenfeld, Steven H [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
    Date Published:July 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Greenfeld, Steven H [Discharging Debtor]
    Date Published:July 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Greenfeld, Steven H [Final Decree and Close Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:July 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Greenfeld, Steven H [Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:June 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Greenfeld, Steven H [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
    Date Published:June 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Greenfeld, Steven H [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
    Date Published:May 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Greenfeld, Steven H [ADI process Return Mail]
    Date Published:April 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Greenfeld, Steven H [Certificate of Compliance]
    Date Published:April 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Greenfeld, Steven H [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:April 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Greenfeld, Steven H [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Requirement to Complete Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:April 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Greenfeld, Steven H [Notice of Prior Filing]
    Date Published:April 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Greenfeld, Steven H [Creditor Request for Notices]
    Date Published:April 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Greenfeld, Steven H [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7]
    Date Published:April 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Greenfeld, Steven H [none]
    Date Published:April 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Greenfeld, Steven H [Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition (fee) - case upload]
    Date Published:April 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Greenfeld, Steven H [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:April 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Greenfeld, Steven H [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
    Date Published:April 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Greenfeld, Steven H [Statement of Intent]
    Date Published:April 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Greenfeld, Steven H [Social Security Number Verification Page]
    Date Published:April 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Greenfeld, Steven H [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
    Date Published:April 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Thomas, Robert S. [Discharging Trustee and Closing Case]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Thomas, Robert S. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report (batch)]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Thomas, Robert S. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:September 28, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Thomas, Robert S. [Vacate]
    Date Published:August 09, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Thomas, Robert S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:July 28, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Thomas, Robert S. [Dismiss Case]
    Date Published:July 26, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Thomas, Robert S. [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:June 28, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Thomas, Robert S. [Notice of Change of Address]
    Date Published:February 08, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Thomas, Robert S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:December 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Thomas, Robert S. [Employee Payment Order]
    Date Published:December 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Vetter, Gerard R. (Ch13) [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:February 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cosby, Ellen W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:October 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cosby, Ellen W. [Court Instruction]
    Date Published:October 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cosby, Ellen W. [Disposition Without Hearing]
    Date Published:October 09, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cosby, Ellen W. [Creditor Request for Notices]
    Date Published:January 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cosby, Ellen W. [none]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.mdb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?632259
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 2 =