open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Maryland

MARYLAND PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Maryland
    Case Number:14-17217
    Party Name:Michelle Williams and Sam Williams
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [Final Decree and Close Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:July 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [ADI process Return Mail]
    Date Published:July 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [Case Eligible to Close Without Discharge]
    Date Published:July 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report (batch)]
    Date Published:July 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [Notice of Completion of Plan Payments (batch)]
    Date Published:March 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [Notice of Change of Address]
    Date Published:February 05, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change (No Proof of Claim Filed)]
    Date Published:December 18, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [Withdrawal of Claim]
    Date Published:December 05, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:January 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [Modify Secured Debt]
    Date Published:January 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [Consent]
    Date Published:January 12, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [Line]
    Date Published:January 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [Deficiency Notice]
    Date Published:January 09, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [Modify Secured Debt and Notice of Motion]
    Date Published:January 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
    Date Published:October 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [Withdrawal of Document]
    Date Published:September 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [Notice of Continuance of Hearing]
    Date Published:September 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [Disposition Without Hearing]
    Date Published:September 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:February 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [Claims Memo]
    Date Published:February 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [Waive Pay Order]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.mdb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?640187
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 2 =