open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Maryland

MARYLAND PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Maryland
    Case Number:19-16876
    Party Name:Paul Smith
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Thomas, Robert S. [Discharging Trustee and Closing Case]
    Date Published:August 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Thomas, Robert S. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report (batch)]
    Date Published:August 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Thomas, Robert S. [Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:July 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Thomas, Robert S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:June 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Thomas, Robert S. [Show Cause]
    Date Published:June 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Margulies, Laura J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
    Date Published:May 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Margulies, Laura J. [Final Decree and Close Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:May 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Margulies, Laura J. [Discharging Debtor]
    Date Published:May 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Thomas, Robert S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:May 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Thomas, Robert S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:May 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Thomas, Robert S. [Notice of Prior Filing]
    Date Published:May 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Thomas, Robert S. [Receipt of Filing Fee]
    Date Published:May 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Thomas, Robert S. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
    Date Published:May 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Thomas, Robert S. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:May 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Thomas, Robert S. [Social Security Number Verification Page]
    Date Published:May 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:May 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Social Security Number Verification Page]
    Date Published:May 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Margulies, Laura J. [Striking Deficient Pleading or Document]
    Date Published:April 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Margulies, Laura J. [Amended Notice of Motion (sets obj deadline)]
    Date Published:April 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Margulies, Laura J. [Withdrawal of Document]
    Date Published:April 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Margulies, Laura J. [Amended Motion]
    Date Published:April 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Margulies, Laura J. [Memorandum]
    Date Published:April 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Margulies, Laura J. [Response]
    Date Published:April 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Margulies, Laura J. [Court Instruction]
    Date Published:April 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Margulies, Laura J. [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:April 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Margulies, Laura J. [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:April 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Margulies, Laura J. [Schedule I]
    Date Published:April 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Margulies, Laura J. [Notice (attorney/Trustee use)]
    Date Published:April 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Margulies, Laura J. [Notice of Motion (sets obj deadline)]
    Date Published:April 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Margulies, Laura J. [Shorten Time]
    Date Published:March 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Margulies, Laura J. [Sell and Notice of Motion]
    Date Published:March 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Margulies, Laura J. [Deficiency Satisfied]
    Date Published:March 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Margulies, Laura J. [Amended Statement of Financial Affairs]
    Date Published:March 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Margulies, Laura J. [Declaration About Individual Debtors Schedules]
    Date Published:March 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Margulies, Laura J. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
    Date Published:March 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Margulies, Laura J. [Deficiency Notice]
    Date Published:March 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Margulies, Laura J. [Amended Schedules]
    Date Published:March 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Margulies, Laura J. [Withdrawal of Non-Compliance]
    Date Published:March 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Margulies, Laura J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:March 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Margulies, Laura J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:February 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Margulies, Laura J. [Update Other Deadlines]
    Date Published:February 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Margulies, Laura J. [Objecting to Discharge]
    Date Published:February 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Margulies, Laura J. [Notice of Continuance of Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:February 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Margulies, Laura J. [Continue Hearing]
    Date Published:February 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Margulies, Laura J. [Trustee's Report of Debtor(s) Non-Compliance with Section 521]
    Date Published:February 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Margulies, Laura J. [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
    Date Published:February 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Margulies, Laura J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:February 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Margulies, Laura J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Requirement to Complete Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:February 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Margulies, Laura J. [Certificate of Compliance]
    Date Published:January 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Margulies, Laura J. [Creditor Request for Notices]
    Date Published:January 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Margulies, Laura J. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7]
    Date Published:January 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Margulies, Laura J. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:January 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:January 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Margulies, Laura J. [none]
    Date Published:January 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 [none]
    Date Published:January 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Margulies, Laura J. [Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition (fee) - case upload]
    Date Published:January 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Margulies, Laura J. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
    Date Published:January 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Margulies, Laura J. [Statement of Intent]
    Date Published:January 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Margulies, Laura J. [Social Security Number Verification Page]
    Date Published:January 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Margulies, Laura J. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
    Date Published:January 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 [Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition (fee) - case upload]
    Date Published:January 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
    Date Published:January 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 [Statement of Intent]
    Date Published:January 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 [Social Security Number Verification Page]
    Date Published:January 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
    Date Published:January 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kremen, Richard M. [Receipt of Installment Payment]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.mdb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?639672
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 2 =