open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Maryland

MARYLAND PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Maryland
    Case Number:19-26386
    Party Name:Prosperity Park Properties LLC
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 11 [Operating Report]
    Date Published:February 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 11 [Opposition]
    Date Published:February 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 11 [Declaration About Individual Debtors Schedules]
    Date Published:January 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 11 [Setting Hearing (bk)]
    Date Published:January 29, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 341 Meeting Report]
    Date Published:January 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 11 [Convert Case 11 to 7]
    Date Published:January 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 11 [Employ]
    Date Published:January 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 11 [Line]
    Date Published:January 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 11 [Support Document]
    Date Published:January 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 11 [Amended Statement of Financial Affairs]
    Date Published:January 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 11 [Amended Creditor Matrix]
    Date Published:January 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:January 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Service]
    Date Published:January 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 11 [Amended Schedules]
    Date Published:January 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 11 [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
    Date Published:December 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 11 [Statement of Financial Affairs]
    Date Published:December 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 11 [Schedule G]
    Date Published:December 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 11 [Schedule H]
    Date Published:December 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 11 [Schedule E/F]
    Date Published:December 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 11 [Schedule D]
    Date Published:December 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 11 [Schedule A/B]
    Date Published:December 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 11 [Notice (court use)]
    Date Published:December 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 11 [Deficiency Satisfied]
    Date Published:December 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 11 [Attachment to Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals Ch 11]
    Date Published:December 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 11 [Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors]
    Date Published:December 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Prior Filing]
    Date Published:December 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 11 [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
    Date Published:December 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 11 [Verification of Creditor Matrix]
    Date Published:December 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 11 [none]
    Date Published:December 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 11 [VOLUNTARY Petition (Chapter 11)]
    Date Published:December 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 11 [Close Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:November 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 11 [Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:October 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:October 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 11 [Striking Deficient Pleading or Document]
    Date Published:October 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 11 [ADI process Return Mail]
    Date Published:October 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 11 [Extend Time]
    Date Published:September 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 11 [Deficiency Notice]
    Date Published:September 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Continuance of Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:September 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:September 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:September 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:September 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Deadline for Filing Missing Documents]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 11 [Amended Voluntary Petition]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 11 [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 11 [20 Largest Unsecured Creditors]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.mdb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?737620
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 1 =