open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Maryland

MARYLAND PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Maryland
    Case Number:19-22076
    Party Name:Evelyn J Chapman
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Relief from Stay]
    Date Published:February 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Withdrawal of Document]
    Date Published:February 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Response]
    Date Published:January 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:January 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Denying Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan without Leave to Amend]
    Date Published:January 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [none]
    Date Published:January 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Notice (attorney/Trustee use)]
    Date Published:January 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Relief from Stay and Notice of Motion]
    Date Published:January 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Line]
    Date Published:January 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Requirement to Complete Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:December 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Disposition Without Hearing]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Hearing Set]
    Date Published:December 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:December 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
    Date Published:December 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Chapter 13 341 Meeting Held (Batch)]
    Date Published:November 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Creditor Request for Notices]
    Date Published:October 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Notice of Postpetition Mortgage Fees, Expenses and Charges]
    Date Published:October 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Notice Appointing Standing Trustee (multi)]
    Date Published:September 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [Certificate of Compliance]
    Date Published:September 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:September 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [Statement of Financial Affairs]
    Date Published:September 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:September 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
    Date Published:September 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [Schedules A-J]
    Date Published:September 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [none]
    Date Published:September 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [Chapter 13 Calculation of Disposable Income 122C-2]
    Date Published:September 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [Chapter 13 Statement of Monthly Income 122C-1]
    Date Published:September 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [Amended Creditor Matrix]
    Date Published:September 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [ADI process Return Mail]
    Date Published:September 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [Extend Time]
    Date Published:September 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
    Date Published:September 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:September 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:September 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:September 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [Notice of Prior Filing]
    Date Published:September 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [Receipt of Filing Fee]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [Social Security Number Verification Page]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.mdb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?737622
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 3 =