open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Maryland

MARYLAND PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Maryland
    Case Number:19-22123
    Party Name:Mark Diaz
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Branigan, Timothy P. [Withdrawal of Document]
    Date Published:January 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Branigan, Timothy P. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:December 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Branigan, Timothy P. [Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:December 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Branigan, Timothy P. [Denying Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan with Leave to Amend]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Branigan, Timothy P. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Requirement to Complete Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:December 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Branigan, Timothy P. [Disposition Without Hearing]
    Date Published:December 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Branigan, Timothy P. [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
    Date Published:December 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Branigan, Timothy P. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
    Date Published:November 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Branigan, Timothy P. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan (batch)]
    Date Published:October 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Branigan, Timothy P. [Chapter 13 341 Meeting Held (Batch-w/o pdf)]
    Date Published:October 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Branigan, Timothy P. [Certificate of Compliance]
    Date Published:September 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Branigan, Timothy P. [Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:September 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Branigan, Timothy P. [Chapter 13 Calculation of Disposable Income 122C-2]
    Date Published:September 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Branigan, Timothy P. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
    Date Published:September 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Branigan, Timothy P. [Declaration About Individual Debtors Schedules]
    Date Published:September 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Branigan, Timothy P. [Schedules A-J]
    Date Published:September 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Branigan, Timothy P. [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
    Date Published:September 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Branigan, Timothy P. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:September 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Branigan, Timothy P. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:September 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Branigan, Timothy P. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:September 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Branigan, Timothy P. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:September 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Branigan, Timothy P. [Notice of Prior Filing]
    Date Published:September 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Branigan, Timothy P. [Hearing Set]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Branigan, Timothy P. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.mdb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?737619
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 3 =