open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Maryland

MARYLAND PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Maryland
    Case Number:19-22122
    Party Name:Bernard Alexander Lancaster, III
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Margulies, Laura J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
    Date Published:December 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Margulies, Laura J. [Final Decree and Close Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:December 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Margulies, Laura J. [Discharging Debtor]
    Date Published:December 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Margulies, Laura J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:December 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Margulies, Laura J. [Relief from Stay]
    Date Published:December 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Margulies, Laura J. [Disposition Without Hearing]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Margulies, Laura J. [Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:November 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Margulies, Laura J. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
    Date Published:October 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Margulies, Laura J. [Relief from Stay and Notice of Motion]
    Date Published:October 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Margulies, Laura J. [Deficiency Satisfied]
    Date Published:October 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Margulies, Laura J. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Initial Report]
    Date Published:October 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Margulies, Laura J. [Deficiency Notice]
    Date Published:October 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Margulies, Laura J. [Amended Schedules]
    Date Published:October 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Margulies, Laura J. [ADI process Return Mail]
    Date Published:September 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Margulies, Laura J. [Chapter 7 Means Test Calculation 122A-2]
    Date Published:September 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Margulies, Laura J. [Certificate of Compliance]
    Date Published:September 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Margulies, Laura J. [Filing Fee - Amended Matrix/Schedules]
    Date Published:September 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Margulies, Laura J. [none]
    Date Published:September 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Margulies, Laura J. [Declaration About Individual Debtors Schedules]
    Date Published:September 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Margulies, Laura J. [Verification of Creditor Matrix]
    Date Published:September 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Margulies, Laura J. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
    Date Published:September 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Margulies, Laura J. [Schedules A-J]
    Date Published:September 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Margulies, Laura J. [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
    Date Published:September 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Margulies, Laura J. [Statement of Intent]
    Date Published:September 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Margulies, Laura J. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
    Date Published:September 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Margulies, Laura J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:September 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Margulies, Laura J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Requirement to Complete Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:September 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Margulies, Laura J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:September 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Margulies, Laura J. [Notice of Deadline for Filing Missing Documents]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Margulies, Laura J. [Notice of Deadline for Filing Statement of Intention]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Margulies, Laura J. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.mdb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?737618
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 3 =