open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Maryland

MARYLAND PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Maryland
    Case Number:19-22125
    Party Name:Patricia Ann Beasley
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Branigan, Timothy P. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:November 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Branigan, Timothy P. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan (batch)]
    Date Published:November 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Branigan, Timothy P. [Certificate of Compliance]
    Date Published:October 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Branigan, Timothy P. [Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case]
    Date Published:October 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Branigan, Timothy P. [Chapter 13 341 Meeting Held (Batch-w/o pdf)]
    Date Published:October 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Branigan, Timothy P. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:September 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Branigan, Timothy P. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:September 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Branigan, Timothy P. [Notice of Prior Filing]
    Date Published:September 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Branigan, Timothy P. [Hearing Set]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Branigan, Timothy P. [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Branigan, Timothy P. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Branigan, Timothy P. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Branigan, Timothy P. [none]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Branigan, Timothy P. [Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition (fee) - case upload]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Branigan, Timothy P. [Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Branigan, Timothy P. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Branigan, Timothy P. [Chapter 13 Statement of Current Monthly and Disposable Income]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Branigan, Timothy P. [Social Security Number Verification Page]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.mdb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?737621
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 2 =