open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Maryland

MARYLAND PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Maryland
    Case Number:19-22167
    Party Name:Tracey Yvette Frazier
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Almy, Monique D. [Final Decree and Close Bankruptcy Case - AutoClose]
    Date Published:December 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Almy, Monique D. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
    Date Published:December 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Almy, Monique D. [Discharging Debtor - AutoDischarge]
    Date Published:December 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Almy, Monique D. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
    Date Published:October 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Almy, Monique D. [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
    Date Published:October 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Almy, Monique D. [ADI process Return Mail]
    Date Published:September 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Almy, Monique D. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:September 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Almy, Monique D. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Requirement to Complete Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:September 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Almy, Monique D. [Certificate of Compliance]
    Date Published:September 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Almy, Monique D. [none]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Almy, Monique D. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Almy, Monique D. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Almy, Monique D. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Almy, Monique D. [Social Security Number Verification Page]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Almy, Monique D. [Statement of Intent]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Almy, Monique D. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Almy, Monique D. [Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition (fee) - case upload]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.mdb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?737663
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 3 =