open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Maryland

MARYLAND PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Maryland
    Case Number:19-25959
    Party Name:Janice Viola Hemphill
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schlossberg, Roger [Hearing Set]
    Date Published:March 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schlossberg, Roger [Setting Hearing (bk)]
    Date Published:March 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schlossberg, Roger [Reaffirmation Agreement]
    Date Published:March 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schlossberg, Roger [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
    Date Published:March 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schlossberg, Roger [Discharging Debtor - AutoDischarge]
    Date Published:March 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schlossberg, Roger [Receipt of Installment Payment (Final)]
    Date Published:March 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schlossberg, Roger [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
    Date Published:March 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schlossberg, Roger [ADI process Return Mail]
    Date Published:February 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schlossberg, Roger [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
    Date Published:February 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schlossberg, Roger [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
    Date Published:February 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schlossberg, Roger [Amended Statement of Financial Affairs]
    Date Published:February 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schlossberg, Roger [Declaration About Individual Debtors Schedules]
    Date Published:February 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schlossberg, Roger [Schedule I]
    Date Published:February 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schlossberg, Roger [Schedule D]
    Date Published:February 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schlossberg, Roger [Schedule A/B]
    Date Published:February 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schlossberg, Roger [Withdrawal of Non-Compliance]
    Date Published:February 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schlossberg, Roger [Trustee's Report of Debtor(s) Non-Compliance with Section 521]
    Date Published:January 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schlossberg, Roger [Update Final Installment Deadline]
    Date Published:December 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schlossberg, Roger [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
    Date Published:December 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schlossberg, Roger [Update Other Deadlines]
    Date Published:December 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schlossberg, Roger [Reconsider]
    Date Published:December 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schlossberg, Roger [Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:December 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schlossberg, Roger [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
    Date Published:December 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schlossberg, Roger [Schedules A-J]
    Date Published:December 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schlossberg, Roger [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
    Date Published:December 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schlossberg, Roger [Statement of Financial Affairs]
    Date Published:December 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schlossberg, Roger [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:December 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schlossberg, Roger [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Requirement to Complete Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:December 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schlossberg, Roger [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:December 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schlossberg, Roger [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:December 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schlossberg, Roger [Notice of Prior Filing]
    Date Published:December 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schlossberg, Roger [Receipt of Installment Payment]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schlossberg, Roger [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schlossberg, Roger [Notice of Deadline for Filing Statement of Intention]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schlossberg, Roger [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schlossberg, Roger [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schlossberg, Roger [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schlossberg, Roger [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schlossberg, Roger [Social Security Number Verification Page]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.mdb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?741652
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 2 =