open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Maryland

MARYLAND PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Maryland
    Case Number:19-25942
    Party Name:Shanee Silver
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jefferson, Patricia B. [Final Decree and Close Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:April 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jefferson, Patricia B. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
    Date Published:April 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jefferson, Patricia B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
    Date Published:March 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jefferson, Patricia B. [Discharging Debtor]
    Date Published:March 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jefferson, Patricia B. [Amended Creditor Matrix]
    Date Published:March 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jefferson, Patricia B. [Declaration About Individual Debtors Schedules]
    Date Published:March 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jefferson, Patricia B. [Amended Voluntary Petition]
    Date Published:March 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jefferson, Patricia B. [Receipt of Filing Fee]
    Date Published:March 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jefferson, Patricia B. [Receipt of Installment Payment (Final)]
    Date Published:March 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jefferson, Patricia B. [Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:March 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jefferson, Patricia B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:February 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jefferson, Patricia B. [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
    Date Published:February 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jefferson, Patricia B. [Meeting of Creditors Continued]
    Date Published:February 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jefferson, Patricia B. [Notice of Change of Address]
    Date Published:December 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jefferson, Patricia B. [ADI process Return Mail]
    Date Published:December 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jefferson, Patricia B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:December 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jefferson, Patricia B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Requirement to Complete Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:December 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jefferson, Patricia B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:December 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jefferson, Patricia B. [Receipt of Installment Payment]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jefferson, Patricia B. [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jefferson, Patricia B. [Certificate of Compliance]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jefferson, Patricia B. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jefferson, Patricia B. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jefferson, Patricia B. [Statement of Intent]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Statement of Intent]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jefferson, Patricia B. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jefferson, Patricia B. [Social Security Number Verification Page]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Social Security Number Verification Page]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jefferson, Patricia B. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jefferson, Patricia B. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.mdb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?741673
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 3 =