open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Maryland

MARYLAND PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Maryland
    Case Number:19-26022
    Party Name:Jason H Shorter, Jr.
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Fisher, Morgan W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
    Date Published:June 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Fisher, Morgan W. [Discharging Debtor - AutoDischarge]
    Date Published:June 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Fisher, Morgan W. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
    Date Published:March 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Fisher, Morgan W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:February 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Fisher, Morgan W. [Relief from Stay]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Fisher, Morgan W. [Disposition Without Hearing]
    Date Published:February 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Fisher, Morgan W. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Initial Report]
    Date Published:January 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Fisher, Morgan W. [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
    Date Published:January 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Fisher, Morgan W. [Relief from Stay and Notice of Motion]
    Date Published:January 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Fisher, Morgan W. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:December 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Fisher, Morgan W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Fisher, Morgan W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Requirement to Complete Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Fisher, Morgan W. [Certificate of Compliance]
    Date Published:December 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Fisher, Morgan W. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Fisher, Morgan W. [none]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Fisher, Morgan W. [Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition (fee) - case upload]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Fisher, Morgan W. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Fisher, Morgan W. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Fisher, Morgan W. [Statement of Intent]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Fisher, Morgan W. [Social Security Number Verification Page]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Fisher, Morgan W. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.mdb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?741672
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 2 =