open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Maryland

MARYLAND PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Maryland
    Case Number:19-26020
    Party Name:Tanisha Brown
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Branigan, Timothy P. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing]
    Date Published:June 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Branigan, Timothy P. [Notice of Hearing Continued - COVID LIFT STAYS (Chambers Use Only)]
    Date Published:June 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Branigan, Timothy P. [Response]
    Date Published:May 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Branigan, Timothy P. [Notice of Postpetition Mortgage Fees, Expenses and Charges]
    Date Published:April 29, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Branigan, Timothy P. [Compensation]
    Date Published:April 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Branigan, Timothy P. [Relief from Stay and Notice of Motion]
    Date Published:April 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Branigan, Timothy P. [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:March 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Branigan, Timothy P. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Requirement to Complete Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:March 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Branigan, Timothy P. [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
    Date Published:March 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Branigan, Timothy P. [Disposition Without Hearing]
    Date Published:February 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Branigan, Timothy P. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan (batch)]
    Date Published:January 29, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Branigan, Timothy P. [Chapter 13 341 Meeting Held (Batch-w/o pdf)]
    Date Published:January 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Branigan, Timothy P. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:January 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Branigan, Timothy P. [Hearing Set]
    Date Published:January 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Branigan, Timothy P. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:January 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Branigan, Timothy P. [Amended Schedules]
    Date Published:January 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Branigan, Timothy P. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Branigan, Timothy P. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Branigan, Timothy P. [Creditor Request for Notices]
    Date Published:December 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Branigan, Timothy P. [Certificate of Compliance]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Branigan, Timothy P. [none]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Branigan, Timothy P. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Branigan, Timothy P. [Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Branigan, Timothy P. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Branigan, Timothy P. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Branigan, Timothy P. [Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition (fee) - case upload]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Branigan, Timothy P. [Chapter 13 Statement of Current Monthly and Disposable Income]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Branigan, Timothy P. [Social Security Number Verification Page]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.mdb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?741670
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 2 =