open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Maryland

MARYLAND PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Maryland
    Case Number:20-15478
    Party Name:Debra V. Rainey
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rose, Cheryl E. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:May 29, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rose, Cheryl E. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Requirement to Complete Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:May 29, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rose, Cheryl E. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:May 29, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rose, Cheryl E. [Deficiency Notice]
    Date Published:May 29, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rose, Cheryl E. [Amended Schedules]
    Date Published:May 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rose, Cheryl E. [Certificate of Compliance]
    Date Published:May 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rose, Cheryl E. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:May 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rose, Cheryl E. [Creditor Request for Notices]
    Date Published:May 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rose, Cheryl E. [none]
    Date Published:May 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rose, Cheryl E. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7]
    Date Published:May 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rose, Cheryl E. [Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition (fee) - case upload]
    Date Published:May 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rose, Cheryl E. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
    Date Published:May 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rose, Cheryl E. [Statement of Intent]
    Date Published:May 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rose, Cheryl E. [Social Security Number Verification Page]
    Date Published:May 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rose, Cheryl E. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
    Date Published:May 23, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.mdb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?748540
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 3 =