open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Maryland

MARYLAND PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Maryland
    Case Number:20-17145
    Party Name:Michelle Jenifer
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldstein, Charles R. [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
    Date Published:August 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldstein, Charles R. [Notice of Prior Filing (Auto-Docket)]
    Date Published:August 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldstein, Charles R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors (Auto-Docket)]
    Date Published:August 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldstein, Charles R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Ntc of Requirement to Complete Financial Mgmt Course (Auto-Docket)]
    Date Published:August 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldstein, Charles R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - BK (Auto-Docket)]
    Date Published:August 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldstein, Charles R. [Creditor Request for Notices]
    Date Published:August 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldstein, Charles R. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7]
    Date Published:July 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldstein, Charles R. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
    Date Published:July 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
    Date Published:July 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldstein, Charles R. [Disclosure of Compensation of Bankruptcy Petition Preparer]
    Date Published:July 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Disclosure of Compensation of Bankruptcy Petition Preparer]
    Date Published:July 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldstein, Charles R. [Bankruptcy Petition Preparer's Notice, Declaration, and Signature (Form 119)]
    Date Published:July 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Bankruptcy Petition Preparer's Notice, Declaration, and Signature (Form 119)]
    Date Published:July 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldstein, Charles R. [Statement of Intent]
    Date Published:July 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Statement of Intent]
    Date Published:July 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldstein, Charles R. [Social Security Number Verification Page]
    Date Published:July 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Social Security Number Verification Page]
    Date Published:July 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldstein, Charles R. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
    Date Published:July 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
    Date Published:July 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldstein, Charles R. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) - Court Use]
    Date Published:July 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) - Court Use]
    Date Published:July 31, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.mdb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?750329
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 1 =