open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Maryland

MARYLAND PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Maryland
    Case Number:20-17412
    Party Name:Lakeisha Nicole Stevenson
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Guttman, Zvi [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (Auto-Docket)]
    Date Published:September 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Guttman, Zvi [Statement of Review]
    Date Published:September 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Guttman, Zvi [Certificate of Compliance]
    Date Published:September 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Guttman, Zvi [Reaffirmation Agreement]
    Date Published:September 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Guttman, Zvi [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution (Trustee Use Only)]
    Date Published:September 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Guttman, Zvi [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
    Date Published:September 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Guttman, Zvi [Line (Court Use Only)]
    Date Published:September 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Guttman, Zvi [Returned Mail (Auto-Docket)]
    Date Published:August 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Guttman, Zvi [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors (Auto-Docket)]
    Date Published:August 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Guttman, Zvi [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Ntc of Requirement to Complete Financial Mgmt Course (Auto-Docket)]
    Date Published:August 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Guttman, Zvi [BNC Certificate of Mailing - BK (Auto-Docket)]
    Date Published:August 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Guttman, Zvi [Notice of Prior Filing (Auto-Docket)]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Guttman, Zvi [Creditor Request for Notices]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Guttman, Zvi [Statement Under Penalty of Perjury Re: Payment Advices]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Guttman, Zvi [none]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Guttman, Zvi [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Guttman, Zvi [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Guttman, Zvi [Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition (fee) - case upload]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Guttman, Zvi [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Guttman, Zvi [Statement of Intent]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Guttman, Zvi [Social Security Number Verification Page]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Guttman, Zvi [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.mdb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?750562
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 2 =