open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Maryland

MARYLAND PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Maryland
    Case Number:20-17411
    Party Name:Latonya Nicole Williams
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldstein, Charles R. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution (Trustee Use Only)]
    Date Published:September 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldstein, Charles R. [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
    Date Published:September 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldstein, Charles R. [Returned Mail (Auto-Docket)]
    Date Published:August 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldstein, Charles R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors (Auto-Docket)]
    Date Published:August 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldstein, Charles R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Ntc of Requirement to Complete Financial Mgmt Course (Auto-Docket)]
    Date Published:August 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldstein, Charles R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - BK (Auto-Docket)]
    Date Published:August 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldstein, Charles R. [Certificate of Compliance]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldstein, Charles R. [Notice of Prior Filing (Auto-Docket)]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldstein, Charles R. [Creditor Request for Notices]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldstein, Charles R. [none]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldstein, Charles R. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldstein, Charles R. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldstein, Charles R. [Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition (fee) - case upload]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldstein, Charles R. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldstein, Charles R. [Statement of Intent]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldstein, Charles R. [Social Security Number Verification Page]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldstein, Charles R. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.mdb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?750561
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 3 =