open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Maryland

MARYLAND PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Maryland
    Case Number:20-17409
    Party Name:Aubree Erica Green
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Guttman, Zvi [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution (Trustee Use Only)]
    Date Published:September 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Guttman, Zvi [Returned Mail (Auto-Docket)]
    Date Published:August 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Guttman, Zvi [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
    Date Published:August 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Guttman, Zvi [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors (Auto-Docket)]
    Date Published:August 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Guttman, Zvi [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Ntc of Requirement to Complete Financial Mgmt Course (Auto-Docket)]
    Date Published:August 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Guttman, Zvi [BNC Certificate of Mailing - BK (Auto-Docket)]
    Date Published:August 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Guttman, Zvi [Certificate of Compliance]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Guttman, Zvi [none]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Guttman, Zvi [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Guttman, Zvi [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Guttman, Zvi [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Guttman, Zvi [Statement of Intent]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Guttman, Zvi [Social Security Number Verification Page]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Guttman, Zvi [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Guttman, Zvi [Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition (fee) - case upload]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.mdb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?750559
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 3 =