open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Maryland

MARYLAND PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Maryland
    Case Number:20-17415
    Party Name:Paul Christoph Mayer
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schlossberg, Roger [Withdrawal of Non-Compliance]
    Date Published:September 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schlossberg, Roger [Meeting of Creditors Continued (Trustee Use)]
    Date Published:September 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schlossberg, Roger [Trustee's Report of Debtor(s) Non-Compliance with Section 521]
    Date Published:September 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schlossberg, Roger [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (Auto-Docket)]
    Date Published:August 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schlossberg, Roger [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
    Date Published:August 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schlossberg, Roger [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors (Auto-Docket)]
    Date Published:August 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schlossberg, Roger [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Ntc of Requirement to Complete Financial Mgmt Course (Auto-Docket)]
    Date Published:August 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schlossberg, Roger [BNC Certificate of Mailing - BK (Auto-Docket)]
    Date Published:August 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schlossberg, Roger [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7]
    Date Published:August 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schlossberg, Roger [Amended Voluntary Petition]
    Date Published:August 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Amended Voluntary Petition]
    Date Published:August 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [none]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Filing Fee - Chapter 7 Installment Payment]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Verification of Creditor Matrix]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Social Security Number Verification Page]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Chapter 7 Means Test Calculation 122A-2]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Declaration About Individual Debtors Schedules]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) - Case Opening]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.mdb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?750565
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 1 =