open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Maryland

MARYLAND PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Maryland
    Case Number:20-17419
    Party Name:Annie Marie Murdock
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Guttman, Zvi [Notice of Abandonment]
    Date Published:September 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Guttman, Zvi [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution (Trustee Use Only)]
    Date Published:September 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Guttman, Zvi [Returned Mail (Auto-Docket)]
    Date Published:August 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Guttman, Zvi [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (Auto-Docket)]
    Date Published:August 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Guttman, Zvi [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors (Auto-Docket)]
    Date Published:August 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Guttman, Zvi [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Ntc of Requirement to Complete Financial Mgmt Course (Auto-Docket)]
    Date Published:August 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Guttman, Zvi [BNC Certificate of Mailing - BK (Auto-Docket)]
    Date Published:August 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Guttman, Zvi [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
    Date Published:August 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Guttman, Zvi [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:August 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Guttman, Zvi [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Guttman, Zvi [Creditor Request for Notices]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Guttman, Zvi [Notice of Deadline for Filing Missing Documents]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Guttman, Zvi [Certificate of Compliance]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Guttman, Zvi [none]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Guttman, Zvi [Schedules A-J]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Guttman, Zvi [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Guttman, Zvi [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Guttman, Zvi [Social Security Number Verification Page]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Guttman, Zvi [Statement of Intent]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Guttman, Zvi [Statement of Financial Affairs]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Guttman, Zvi [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Guttman, Zvi [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Guttman, Zvi [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) - Case Opening]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) - Case Opening]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.mdb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?750569
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 2 =