open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Maryland

MARYLAND PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Maryland
    Case Number:20-18435
    Party Name:Shaneika Renaye Hammond
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Fisher, Morgan W. [Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:September 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Fisher, Morgan W. [Deficiency Notice]
    Date Published:September 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Fisher, Morgan W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (Auto-Docket)]
    Date Published:September 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Fisher, Morgan W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors (Auto-Docket)]
    Date Published:September 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Fisher, Morgan W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Ntc of Requirement to Complete Financial Mgmt Course (Auto-Docket)]
    Date Published:September 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Fisher, Morgan W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - BK (Auto-Docket)]
    Date Published:September 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Fisher, Morgan W. [Notice of Prior Filing (Auto-Docket)]
    Date Published:September 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Fisher, Morgan W. [Receipt of Filing Fee (Auto-Docket)]
    Date Published:September 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Fisher, Morgan W. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7]
    Date Published:September 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Fisher, Morgan W. [Application to Have the Filing Fee Waived]
    Date Published:September 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Fisher, Morgan W. [Statement of Intent]
    Date Published:September 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Fisher, Morgan W. [Social Security Number Verification Page]
    Date Published:September 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Fisher, Morgan W. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
    Date Published:September 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Fisher, Morgan W. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) - Court Use]
    Date Published:September 16, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.mdb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?751647
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 3 =