open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Maryland

MARYLAND PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Maryland
    Case Number:20-18440
    Party Name:Dominique Lamar Strong
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jefferson, Patricia B. [Certificate of Compliance]
    Date Published:September 29, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jefferson, Patricia B. [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
    Date Published:September 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jefferson, Patricia B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors (Auto-Docket)]
    Date Published:September 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jefferson, Patricia B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Ntc of Requirement to Complete Financial Mgmt Course (Auto-Docket)]
    Date Published:September 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jefferson, Patricia B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - BK (Auto-Docket)]
    Date Published:September 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jefferson, Patricia B. [Creditor Request for Notices]
    Date Published:September 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jefferson, Patricia B. [Receipt of Filing Fee (Auto-Docket)]
    Date Published:September 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jefferson, Patricia B. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7]
    Date Published:September 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jefferson, Patricia B. [Disclosure of Compensation of Bankruptcy Petition Preparer]
    Date Published:September 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jefferson, Patricia B. [Bankruptcy Petition Preparer's Notice, Declaration, and Signature (Form 119)]
    Date Published:September 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jefferson, Patricia B. [Statement Under Penalty of Perjury Re: Payment Advices]
    Date Published:September 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jefferson, Patricia B. [Statement of Intent]
    Date Published:September 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jefferson, Patricia B. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:September 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jefferson, Patricia B. [Social Security Number Verification Page]
    Date Published:September 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jefferson, Patricia B. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
    Date Published:September 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jefferson, Patricia B. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) - Court Use]
    Date Published:September 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) - Court Use]
    Date Published:September 16, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.mdb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?751659
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 1 =