open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Maryland

MARYLAND PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Maryland
    Case Number:20-19361
    Party Name:Devon Darnell Claggett and Bonniette Lavarn Claggett
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Branigan, Timothy P. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:October 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Branigan, Timothy P. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors (Auto-Docket)]
    Date Published:October 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Branigan, Timothy P. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (Auto-Docket)]
    Date Published:October 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Branigan, Timothy P. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - BK (Auto-Docket)]
    Date Published:October 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Branigan, Timothy P. [Hearing Set]
    Date Published:October 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Branigan, Timothy P. [Certificate of Compliance]
    Date Published:October 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Branigan, Timothy P. [Notice of Prior Filing (Auto-Docket)]
    Date Published:October 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Branigan, Timothy P. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
    Date Published:October 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Branigan, Timothy P. [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:October 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:October 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Branigan, Timothy P. [none]
    Date Published:October 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 [none]
    Date Published:October 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Branigan, Timothy P. [Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition (fee) - case upload]
    Date Published:October 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Branigan, Timothy P. [Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:October 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Branigan, Timothy P. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
    Date Published:October 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Branigan, Timothy P. [Chapter 13 Statement of Current Monthly and Disposable Income]
    Date Published:October 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Branigan, Timothy P. [Social Security Number Verification Page]
    Date Published:October 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Branigan, Timothy P. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:October 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 [Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition (fee) - case upload]
    Date Published:October 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 [Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:October 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
    Date Published:October 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 [Chapter 13 Statement of Current Monthly and Disposable Income]
    Date Published:October 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 [Social Security Number Verification Page]
    Date Published:October 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:October 17, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.mdb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?752589
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 2 =