open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri

MISSOURI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri
    Case Number:4:11-cv-00077
    Party Name:United States of America v. Ameren Missouri
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Court]
    Date Published:August 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Status Report]
    Date Published:April 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Records Transmittal]
    Date Published:December 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [USCA Order]
    Date Published:November 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Filing Exhibit]
    Date Published:November 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Alter Judgment]
    Date Published:October 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Letter from USCA]
    Date Published:October 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Briefing Schedule from USCA]
    Date Published:October 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Notification from USCA]
    Date Published:October 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notification of Appeal and NOA Supplement]
    Date Published:October 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appeal]
    Date Published:October 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stay]
    Date Published:October 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment - (Case)]
    Date Published:September 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Supplement]
    Date Published:May 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [NextGen Remark]
    Date Published:May 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Exhibit Receipt]
    Date Published:April 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pretrial Conference]
    Date Published:April 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
    Date Published:March 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Order to Show Cause]
    Date Published:February 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order to Show Cause]
    Date Published:February 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Supplemental Authority]
    Date Published:February 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Statement of Material Facts]
    Date Published:November 09, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Sealed Document (no service occurs via CM/ECF)]
    Date Published:September 28, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Compel]
    Date Published:September 28, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:September 28, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Statement of Material Facts]
    Date Published:September 28, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Partial Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:September 28, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum (NON-MOTION EVENT)]
    Date Published:June 25, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum in Opposition of Motion (SEALED)]
    Date Published:June 12, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Compel]
    Date Published:May 29, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Vacate]
    Date Published:August 31, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clarify]
    Date Published:July 19, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Disclosure of Organizational Interests]
    Date Published:June 23, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Protective Order]
    Date Published:May 24, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Joint Scheduling Plan]
    Date Published:April 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply (to termed motion)]
    Date Published:March 02, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Intervene]
    Date Published:February 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum Opinion]
    Date Published:January 23, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Post Trial Brief]
    Date Published:October 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proposed Conclusions of Law]
    Date Published:September 30, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Post Trial Brief]
    Date Published:September 30, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proposed Findings of Fact]
    Date Published:September 30, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:September 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Bench Trial - Completed]
    Date Published:September 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Bench Trial - Resumed but not Concluded]
    Date Published:August 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Bench Trial - Begun]
    Date Published:August 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:August 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pretrial Conference - Final]
    Date Published:August 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:August 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document]
    Date Published:August 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Trial Brief]
    Date Published:August 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Objection to Pretrial]
    Date Published:August 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [In Limine]
    Date Published:August 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Interrogatory Answer List]
    Date Published:July 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Requests for Admissions List]
    Date Published:July 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Deposition Designations]
    Date Published:July 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation]
    Date Published:July 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Witness List]
    Date Published:July 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Transcript Order Request]
    Date Published:July 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension]
    Date Published:July 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Telephone Conference]
    Date Published:July 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Status Conference]
    Date Published:February 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Change of Address]
    Date Published:February 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Continue]
    Date Published:January 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
    Date Published:January 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Certificate of Appealability]
    Date Published:January 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum & Order]
    Date Published:January 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Management Order - Amended]
    Date Published:January 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Transcript (FILED UNDER SEAL)]
    Date Published:January 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:December 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Strike]
    Date Published:December 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Hearing]
    Date Published:December 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:November 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Daubert Hearing]
    Date Published:November 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Motion Hearing]
    Date Published:November 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:November 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Receipt]
    Date Published:November 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Relief]
    Date Published:November 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Entry of Appearance]
    Date Published:November 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:November 12, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Sealed Motion]
    Date Published:November 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [For Leave to File Sealed Motion]
    Date Published:November 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Transcript]
    Date Published:October 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order (will rule a motion and set/satisfy a schedule)]
    Date Published:September 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:September 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Leave to]
    Date Published:September 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
    Date Published:August 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Withdraw as Attorney/Firm]
    Date Published:August 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:July 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [A Docket Text Order]
    Date Published:July 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Exhibit List]
    Date Published:June 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Exclude]
    Date Published:June 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum in Support of Motion (SEALED)]
    Date Published:June 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply to Response to Motion (SEALED)]
    Date Published:June 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [For Leave to File Sealed Document]
    Date Published:June 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply to Response to Motion]
    Date Published:June 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Sealed Document]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.moed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?111313
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 1 =