U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-mj-00262-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Garcia
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: [Electronic Rule 5 Transmittal]
  • April 07, 2025: [Minute Order]
  • April 07, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 01, 2025: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Assertion of Right to Counsel]
  • March 31, 2025: [Assertion of Right to be Unshackled]
  • March 31, 2025: [Waiver of Rule 5c3 Hearings]
  • March 31, 2025: [Order Appointing Counsel FPD]
  • March 31, 2025: [Rule 5c3 Documents Received]
  • March 28, 2025: [Detention Order]
  • March 28, 2025: [Commitment to Another District]
  • March 28, 2025: [Initial Appearance - Rule 5]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.