U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-mj-00327-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gomez-Jacobo
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Stipulation]
  • April 23, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order]
  • April 23, 2025: [Detention Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 22, 2025: [Assertion of Right to be Unshackled]
  • April 22, 2025: [Assertion of Right to Counsel]
  • April 22, 2025: [BICE Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order Appointing Counsel FPD]
  • April 22, 2025: [Stipulation]
  • April 21, 2025: [Minute Order Due Process Protections Act]
  • April 21, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 18, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.