U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cr-00080-3
  • Case Name: USA v. Villar-Lugo et al.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 05, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 02, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 02, 2025: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 30, 2025: [Trial Notice]
  • April 30, 2025: [Order]
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • April 29, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • April 28, 2025: [Stipulation to Detention and/or Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • April 28, 2025: [Endorsed Order - Brady]
  • April 28, 2025: [Initial Appearance/Arraignment]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • April 28, 2025: [Appoint Counsel]
  • April 25, 2025: [Hearing Notice]
  • April 25, 2025: [Arrest]
  • April 18, 2025: [Judgment - Amended]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 15, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 14, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 14, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • April 14, 2025: [Exhibit]
  • April 14, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • April 11, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • April 10, 2025: [LASER Preliminary Hearing]
  • April 10, 2025: [LASER In Chambers Conference]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • April 10, 2025: [Appoint Counsel]
  • April 10, 2025: [Administrative Closure]
  • April 10, 2025: [LASER - Notice]
  • April 10, 2025: [Case Reassigned]
  • April 10, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 07, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • April 04, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • April 03, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • April 02, 2025: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • April 02, 2025: [Transcript]
  • April 01, 2025: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • March 26, 2025: [Continue]
  • March 21, 2025: [Judgment]
February, 2025
  • February 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 19, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum]
December, 2024
  • December 08, 2024: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
October, 2024
  • October 03, 2024: [Hearing Notice]
  • October 03, 2024: [Acknowledgment and Waiver of Rights]
  • October 01, 2024: [Hearing Notice]
  • October 01, 2024: [Plea Agreement]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.