U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00003-7
  • Case Name: USA v. Cantave et al.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Hearing Notice]
  • May 09, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 08, 2025: [Continue]
  • May 08, 2025: [Order on Motion to Waive]
  • May 07, 2025: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • May 07, 2025: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
  • May 07, 2025: [Motion Hearing Notice]
  • May 05, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines PUBLIC]
  • May 01, 2025: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • April 30, 2025: [Waive]
  • April 29, 2025: [Continue Trial]
  • April 24, 2025: [Hearing Notice]
  • April 24, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order - Sealed]
  • April 16, 2025: [Request for Modifying Conditions of Supervision-12B (Court Use Only)]
  • April 07, 2025: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 03, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 02, 2025: [Continue]
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: [Hearing Notice]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 14, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 13, 2025: [Continue]
  • March 12, 2025: [LASER Preliminary Hearing]
  • March 12, 2025: [LASER In Chambers Conference]
  • March 11, 2025: [Hearing Notice]
  • March 11, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
January, 2025
  • January 14, 2025: [Continue]
December, 2024
  • December 13, 2024: [Miscellaneous Filing]
  • December 13, 2024: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Hearing Notice]
  • October 02, 2024: [Hearing Notice]
  • October 02, 2024: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 02, 2024: [Plea Agreement]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.