U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00081-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Toledo
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Collateral Returned]
  • May 09, 2025: [Order]
  • May 06, 2025: [Judgment]
  • May 05, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • May 05, 2025: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • May 05, 2025: [Forfeiture Order]
  • May 05, 2025: [Acknowledgment of Sentencing Options]
  • May 01, 2025: [Notice - Other]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • April 30, 2025: [Forfeiture]
  • April 29, 2025: [Addendum]
  • April 25, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum]
December, 2024
  • December 15, 2024: [Continue Trial]
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • October 07, 2024: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 02, 2024: [Witness List]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.