U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00110-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lancaster
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Hearing Notice]
  • May 09, 2025: [Jury Verdict]
  • May 09, 2025: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • May 09, 2025: [JERS Certification of Exhibits]
  • May 09, 2025: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • May 09, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 09, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 09, 2025: [Jury Trial]
  • May 09, 2025: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • May 09, 2025: [Jury Selection]
  • May 08, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 06, 2025: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • May 05, 2025: [Witness List]
  • May 05, 2025: [Motion Hearing Notice]
  • May 05, 2025: [Memorandum]
  • May 02, 2025: [Objection to Motion]
  • May 02, 2025: [Juror Questionnaires - Supplement]
  • May 02, 2025: [Exclude]
  • May 02, 2025: [Reset Trial Deadlines PUBLIC]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Miscellaneous Filing]
  • April 29, 2025: [Memorandum]
  • April 28, 2025: [Juror Questionnaires]
  • April 24, 2025: [Final Pretrial Conference]
  • April 18, 2025: [Witness List]
  • April 18, 2025: [In Limine]
  • April 18, 2025: [Miscellaneous Filing]
  • April 18, 2025: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • March 11, 2025: [Continue Trial]
November, 2024
  • November 26, 2024: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.