U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00008-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Peralta et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: [Acknowledgment of Sentencing Options]
  • April 15, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 14, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • April 11, 2025: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
  • April 11, 2025: [Extend Time]
  • April 10, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • April 04, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum]
December, 2024
  • December 27, 2024: [Continue]
  • December 20, 2024: [Hearing Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.