U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cr-00119-3
  • Case Name: USA v. Miranda et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Hearing Notice]
  • May 06, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines PUBLIC]
  • May 06, 2025: [Change of Address]
  • May 05, 2025: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
  • May 02, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum]
March, 2025
  • March 17, 2025: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
  • March 17, 2025: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.