U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cr-00018-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Alihan et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Judgment]
  • May 05, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • May 05, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines PUBLIC]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 22, 2025: [Acknowledgment and Waiver of Rights]
  • April 22, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order]
  • April 18, 2025: [Waiver of Presence at Arraignment]
  • April 11, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 11, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • April 11, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 07, 2025: [Sealed Motion - Court Use]
  • April 07, 2025: [Sealed Document]
  • April 04, 2025: [Objection to Motion]
  • April 04, 2025: [Acknowledgment and Waiver of Rights]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 01, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 01, 2025: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
  • April 01, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Bail]
  • March 31, 2025: [Transcript]
  • March 27, 2025: [Trial Notice]
  • March 26, 2025: [Case Reassigned]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Motion for Bail]
  • March 26, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • March 26, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 26, 2025: [Endorsed Order - Brady]
  • March 25, 2025: [Hearing Notice]
  • March 25, 2025: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.