U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cr-00073-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Landry
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Trial Notice]
  • May 07, 2025: [Motion Hearing Notice]
  • May 07, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • May 06, 2025: [Continue Trial]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Trial Reminder]
  • April 16, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • April 15, 2025: [Hearing Notice]
  • April 09, 2025: [Response to Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Seal Document-Court Use]
  • March 26, 2025: [Sealed Document]
  • March 25, 2025: [Addendum]
  • March 25, 2025: [In Limine]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.