U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cr-00020-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Dume-Calderon
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • May 02, 2025: [Continue Trial]
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Trial Reminder]
  • April 17, 2025: [Trial Notice]
  • April 17, 2025: [Endorsed Order - Brady]
  • April 14, 2025: [Arraignment]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Hearing Notice]
  • March 27, 2025: [Warrant Issued]
  • March 27, 2025: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • March 27, 2025: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.