U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cr-00019-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Davis
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • April 22, 2025: [Continue Trial]
  • April 22, 2025: [Trial Reminder]
  • April 15, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • April 14, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 08, 2025: [Stipulation to Detention and/or Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • April 08, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • April 08, 2025: [Appoint Counsel]
  • April 03, 2025: [Trial Notice]
  • April 03, 2025: [Hearing Notice]
  • April 03, 2025: [Case Unsealed]
  • April 03, 2025: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.