U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cr-00031-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hayden et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • May 07, 2025: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 07, 2025: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
  • May 07, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 05, 2025: [Miscellaneous Filing]
  • May 05, 2025: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 05, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • May 02, 2025: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 01, 2025: [Continue Trial]
  • May 01, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • May 01, 2025: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 29, 2025: [Trial Notice]
  • April 29, 2025: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
  • April 29, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • April 28, 2025: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • April 28, 2025: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
  • April 28, 2025: [Waiver of Presence at Arraignment]
  • April 25, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • April 25, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 25, 2025: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 25, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • April 24, 2025: [Miscellaneous Filing]
  • April 24, 2025: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 24, 2025: [Trial Notice]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 24, 2025: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
  • April 24, 2025: [Waiver of Presence at Arraignment]
  • April 23, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • April 23, 2025: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 23, 2025: [Trial Notice]
  • April 23, 2025: [Extend Time]
  • April 22, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 22, 2025: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 22, 2025: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
  • April 21, 2025: [Waiver of Presence at Arraignment]
  • April 21, 2025: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 15, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 15, 2025: [Warrant Issued]
  • April 15, 2025: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • April 15, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • April 15, 2025: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • April 15, 2025: [Organizational Victim]
  • April 15, 2025: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.