U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 16-16270-
  • Case Name: Danielle N Markiewicz
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
July, 2016
  • July 17, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Youngman, Catherine E. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge]
  • July 15, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Youngman, Catherine E. [Final Decree]
  • July 14, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Youngman, Catherine E. [Discharging Debtor - Auto]
June, 2016
  • June 22, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Youngman, Catherine E. [Certification of No Objection]
May, 2016
  • May 27, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Youngman, Catherine E. [BNC Certificate of Notice (generic)]
April, 2016
  • April 03, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Youngman, Catherine E. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors]
March, 2016
  • March 31, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Youngman, Catherine E. [Meeting of Creditors - Add Judge all Chapters]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.