open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of New Jersey

NEW JERSEY PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of New Jersey
    Case Number:19-25719-
    Party Name:Jennifer Adamo
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Russo, Albert [Final Decree]
    Date Published:October 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Russo, Albert [BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:September 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Russo, Albert [Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:September 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Russo, Albert [Hearing Held]
    Date Published:September 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Russo, Albert [BNC Notice & Order To Pay Trustee]
    Date Published:August 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Russo, Albert [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:August 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Russo, Albert [BNC Certificate of Notice - Order ]
    Date Published:August 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Russo, Albert [Receipt of Case Filing Fee - Court Use Only]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Russo, Albert [Show Cause]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Russo, Albert [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors - Add Trustee; Chapter 13]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Russo, Albert [Photo ID of Pro Se Debtor]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Russo, Albert [Statement of Social Security]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.njb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1050193
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 3 =