open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Jersey

NEW JERSEY PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Jersey
    Case Number:3:19-cv-17907
    Party Name:TORO v. WALMART et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Telephone Conference]
    Date Published:February 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Oral Motion]
    Date Published:January 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:October 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Joint Discovery Plan]
    Date Published:October 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Letter]
    Date Published:October 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:September 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Crossclaim]
    Date Published:September 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Removal]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.njd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?416677
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 1 =