open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Jersey

NEW JERSEY PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Jersey
    Case Number:3:19-cv-15986
    Party Name:MICROBILT CORPORATION v. CANTOR
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response (NOT Motion)]
    Date Published:November 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appellees Brief]
    Date Published:October 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:October 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Letter]
    Date Published:October 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Brief]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.njd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?413194
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 1 =