open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Jersey

NEW JERSEY PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Jersey
    Case Number:3:19-cv-20960
    Party Name:MIZRAHI v. MATRIX MEDICAL NETWORK
  • Filing Type:Civil [Terminate Civil Case]
    Date Published:January 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (aty)]
    Date Published:January 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation]
    Date Published:December 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed]
    Date Published:December 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.njd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?422523
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 2 =